MA H1201 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5125
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the endowment match program. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to the endowment match program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5125 |
2019-04-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H1232 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
S1669 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S753 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S2110 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H1228 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H5125 (Replaced by) 2020-11-25 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1669 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S753 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S2110 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H1228 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H5125 (Replaced by) 2020-11-25 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1201 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1201.pdf |