MA S2110 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2560
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a Massachusetts Transportation Endowment Fund (MTEF). Transportation.
Title
To establish a Massachusetts Transportation Endowment Fund (MTEF)
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2560 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied S2560 |
2019-11-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H511 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S344 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2106 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
S965 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3010 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S252 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S2129 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2130 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2114 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S340 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1884 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2184 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3898 (Similar To) 2019-07-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2019
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2341 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2560 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S344 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2106 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
S965 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3010 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S252 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S2129 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2130 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2114 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S340 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1884 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2184 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3898 (Similar To) 2019-07-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2019
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2341 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2560 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2110 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2110.pdf |