MA H1173 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5208
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5208
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5208
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to a dental insurance. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to a dental patient bill of rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5208 |
2021-07-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S1616 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
S236 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2701
H2958 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
H204 (Similar To) 2021-11-02 - Accompanied H212
H1171 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5208
S142 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H212 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H264 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
H5208 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
S236 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2701
H2958 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
H204 (Similar To) 2021-11-02 - Accompanied H212
H1171 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5208
S142 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H212 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H264 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
H5208 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1173 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1173.pdf |