MA H2958 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5200
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to limitations on expenditures and revenues. Revenue.
Title
Relative to the taxpayers’ bill of rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5200 |
2022-01-24 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/25/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/25/2022 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1850 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1616 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
H5200 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H204 (Similar To) 2021-11-02 - Accompanied H212
S1616 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
H5200 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H204 (Similar To) 2021-11-02 - Accompanied H212
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2958 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2958.pdf |