MA H1173 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 95-8)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to applications for nutrition assistance and the development of a common application portal for state-administered needs-based benefits and services. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improving public health through a common application for core food, health and safety-net programs

Sponsors

Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]
Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]
Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]
Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Daniel Carey [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]
Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]
Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]
Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. David Decoste [R]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]
Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]
Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]
Sen. Ryan Fattman [R]Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]
Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]
Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Bradford Hill [R]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]
Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]
Rep. Hannah Kane [R]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]
Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Rep. Rady Mom [D]
Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]
Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R]
Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]
Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [R]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]
Rep. Paul Schmid [D]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Rep. Todd Smola [R]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]
Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Chynah Tyler [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]
Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. John Velis [D]Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]
Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2019-05-20JointHearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

H193 (Similar To) 2019-05-07 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H1841 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H2241 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H1848 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2011 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1311 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1141 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S697 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1285 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1706 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S492 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S962 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1617 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S1289 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback