MA H1173 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to death certificates. Public Health.
Title
Relative to death certificates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-05-21 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-01 | House | House concurred |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2017-11-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1805 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H400 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H24 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H30 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H37 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H39 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H400 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H24 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H30 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H37 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H39 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1173 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1173.pdf |