MA H114 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide financial literacy services to persons receiving financial assistance. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to financial literacy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-03-05 | House | Accompanied by H42 |
2019-10-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H438 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H472 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S262 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H42 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied H114
H616 (Similar To) 2019-12-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4255
H472 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S262 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H42 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied H114
H616 (Similar To) 2019-12-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4255
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H114 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H114.pdf |