MA H42 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

So much of the recommendations of the Department of the State Treasurer (House, No. 27) as relates to financial literacy. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to financial literacy

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-31JointHearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

H43 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
H33 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H35 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H47 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
H39 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H31 (Similar To) 2019-05-28 - Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H34 (Similar To) 2019-07-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H36 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback