MA H1103 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4471
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4471
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4471
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to establishing an advisory commission (including members of the General Court) to study the best practices and safety protocols of state subsidized senior and non-elderly disabled housing. Housing.
Title
Relative to senior and non-elderly disabled housing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4471 |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 18, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday, May 28, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-05-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H4471 (Replaced by) 2014-09-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1103 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1103.pdf |