MA H1085 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to medical malpractice insurance coverage to dentists on the basis of written collaborative agreements with public health dental hygienists. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the collaborative agreement of a public health dental hygienist

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-18JointHearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H1115 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
H1116 (Similar To) 2019-11-13 - Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
H1050 (Similar To) 2019-11-13 - Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
H1715 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1110 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
S635 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S613 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S697 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
H945 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
H947 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback