MA H1078 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4228
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4228
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4228
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require post secondary institutions to inform students of their right to call their parents and their right to an attorney in the event of a disciplinary hearing that may result in expulsion. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to student’s rights in higher education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4228 |
2015-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/03/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4228 (Replaced by) 2016-04-21 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2197 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H1658 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1659 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1876 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1660 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2197 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H1658 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1659 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1876 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1660 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1078 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1078.pdf |