MA H1076 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish secure choice retirement savings plans. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to secure choice retirement savings plan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5160 |
2019-10-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H2268 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2316 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2371 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2357 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2373 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3153 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1593 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1558 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1582 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2196 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2197 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1549 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2257 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2020
S2337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H4158 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4666
S2451 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2316 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2371 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2357 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2373 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3153 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1593 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1558 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1582 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2196 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2197 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1549 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2257 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2020
S2337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H4158 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4666
S2451 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1076 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1076.pdf |