MA H1054 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4976
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to mortgage review boards and a small business loan review board within the Division of Banks. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to mortgage review boards and a small business loan review board within the Division of Banks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4976 |
2021-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H1051 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
H1166 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4550
H4550 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4976 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1166 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4550
H4550 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4976 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1054 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1054.pdf |