MA H1051 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4976
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to licensing and supervision of debt management services by the Division of Banks. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to the licensing and supervision of debt management services in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4976 |
2021-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H1054 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
H1166 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4550
H4976 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1166 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4550
H4976 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1051 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1051.pdf |