MA H1042 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5222
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the display of information on enrollment cards of health plans. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to transparency of consumer health insurance rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5222 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-31 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2021-11-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S651 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2436 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1261 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S60 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2688
S795 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2205 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
H3169 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4969
S1060 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2838
S1208 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2721
S631 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S2173 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H5222 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2162 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2436 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1261 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S60 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2688
S795 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2205 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
H3169 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4969
S1060 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2838
S1208 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2721
S631 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S2173 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H5222 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2162 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1042 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1042.pdf |