MA H1010 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5041
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt veterans from Division of State Parks and Recreation fees. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Providing a parks pass waiver for veterans
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Schmid [D] | Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Sen. Susan Moran [D] |
Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D] | Rep. Jessica Giannino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5041 |
2021-05-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S2455 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
H2883 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3640 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2112 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S2419 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2398 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2921 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2412 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2408 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1744 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1692 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1672 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2421 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S906 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3486 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H3661 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2883 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3640 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2112 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S2419 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2398 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2921 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2412 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2408 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1744 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1692 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1672 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2421 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S906 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3486 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H3661 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1010 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1010.pdf |