MA H1005 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the licensure of motor vehicle damage appraisers. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the licensure of automobile damage appraisers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-28SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-08HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 17, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-09-27JointHearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S2473 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4296 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Senate concurred
H4571 (Similar To) 2024-07-08 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4798 (Similar To) 2024-07-08 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4842 (Similar To) 2024-07-10 - Read third and passed to be engrossed

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback