LA SCSR1 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-06 - Approved on 5/1/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-06 - Approved on 5/1/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests study of the feasibility of proposing a Transportation Infrastructure Model for Economic Development 2 (TIMED 2) program for the state.
Title
Requests study of the feasibility of proposing a Transportation Infrastructure Model for Economic Development 2 (TIMED 2) program for the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | House | Approved on 5/1/2013. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Returned to the Senate and approved. |
2013-04-29 | House | Study request list distributed to members on 4/29/2013. |
2013-04-24 | House | Received on 4/24/2013. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Sent to the House. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Study request list distributed to the members on 4/17/2013. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Request study by the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received by the Senate Office on 4/16/2013. |