LA SCR70 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Barbara Clover on being named the 2010 National Secondary Art Educator of the Year.
Title
Commends Barbara Clover on being named the 2010 National Secondary Art Educator of the Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 70, ADOPT (#504) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-05-12 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-05-12 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-05-11 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-05-11 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |
2010-05-10 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2010-05-10 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |