LA SCR128 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 88-54-2)
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/27/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 88-54-2)
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/27/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences upon the death of former Lieutenant Governor Bobby Freeman.
Title
Expresses condolences upon the death of former Lieutenant Governor Bobby Freeman.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 128 ADOPT (#954) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-30 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/27/2016. |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2016-05-24 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2016-05-24 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |