LA SCR124 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/9/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/9/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences upon the passing of Coach John Thompson of Bossier City.
Title
Expresses condolences upon the passing of Coach John Thompson of Bossier City.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 124 ADOPT (#903) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/9/2017. |
2017-06-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2017-06-07 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2017-06-07 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |