LA HR99 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests each member of the Louisiana House of Representatives to voluntarily serve as a substitute teacher in a public school
Title
Requests each member of the Louisiana House of Representatives to voluntarily serve as a substitute teacher in a public school
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - House - House Vote on HR 99 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1191) (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - House - House Vote on HR 99 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1191) (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - House - House Vote on HR 99 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1191) (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-05-31 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-26 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 78, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2022-05-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2022. |
2022-05-25 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-24 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2022-05-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-05-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |