LA HR43 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes March 28, 2018, as National Federation of Independent Business/Louisiana Small Business Day at the capitol
Title
Recognizes March 28, 2018, as National Federation of Independent Business/Louisiana Small Business Day at the capitol
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2018-03-27 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-03-26 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted. |