LA HR255 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the Louisiana Department of Insurance to study and make recommendations regarding the regulation of private market flood insurance
Title
Urges and requests the Louisiana Department of Insurance to study and make recommendations regarding the regulation of private market flood insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - House - House Vote on HR 255 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#939) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2019-06-05 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-04 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2019-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/04/19. |
2019-05-30 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |