LA HR17 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to procedures required to appropriate certain federal disaster funds for recurring expenses
Title
Provides relative to procedures required to appropriate certain federal disaster funds for recurring expenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - House - House Vote on HR 17 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1286) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-31 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2022-05-31 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/2022. |
2022-05-26 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-26 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2022. |
2022-05-25 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-24 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2022-03-22 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-03-21 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |