LA HCR7 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 65-32-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Memorializes Congress to take actions necessary to review and eliminate or reduce the Government Pension Offset and the Windfall Elimination Provision

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Memorializes Congress to take actions necessary to review and eliminate or reduce the Government Pension Offset and the Windfall Elimination Provision

Sponsors

Rep. Mike Johnson [R]Rep. Daryl Adams [I]Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]
Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]Rep. Beau Beaullieu [R]Rep. Ryan Bourriaque [R]Rep. Ken Brass [D]
Rep. Chad Brown [D]Rep. Rhonda Butler [R]Rep. Barbara Carpenter [D]Rep. Dewith Carrier [R]
Rep. Robert Carter [D]Rep. Wilford Carter [D]Rep. Mack Cormier [D]Rep. Jean-paul Coussan [R]
Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. Raymond Crews [R]Rep. Daryl Deshotel [R]Rep. Royce Duplessis [D]
Rep. Michael Echols [R]Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]Rep. Julie Emerson [R]Rep. Les Farnum [R]
Rep. Gabe Firment [R]Rep. Bryan Fontenot [R]Rep. Aimee Freeman [D]Rep. Barbara Freiberg [R]
Rep. Larry Frieman [R]Rep. Foy Gadberry [R]Rep. Cedric Glover [D]Rep. Jonathan Goudeau [R]
Rep. Lance Harris [R]Rep. Stephanie Hilferty [R]Rep. Valarie Hodges [R]Rep. Paul Hollis [R]
Rep. Dodie Horton [R]Rep. Jason Hughes [D]Rep. John Illg [R]Rep. Barry Ivey [R]
Rep. Edward James [D]Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]Rep. Travis Johnson [D]
Rep. Frederick Jones [D]Rep. Edmond Jordan [D]Rep. Timothy Kerner [R]Rep. Jeremy LaCombe [D]
Rep. Ed Larvadain [D]Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]Rep. Sherman Mack [R]Rep. Tanner Magee [R]
Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]Rep. Joseph Marino [I]Rep. Danny McCormick [R]Rep. Jack McFarland [R]
Rep. Scott McKnight [R]Rep. Wayne McMahen [R]Rep. Blake Miguez [R]Rep. Gregory Miller [R]
Rep. Buddy Mincey [R]Rep. Richard Nelson [R]Rep. Charles Owen [R]Rep. Robert Owen [R]
Rep. Troy Romero [R]Rep. Rodney Schamerhorn [R]Rep. Vincent St. Blanc [R]Rep. Joseph Stagni [R]
Rep. Phillip Tarver [R]Rep. Polly Thomas [R]Rep. Francis Thompson [D]Rep. Debbie Villio [R]
Rep. William Wheat [R]Rep. Malinda White [D]Rep. Matthew Willard [D]Sen. Mark Abraham [R]
Sen. Regina Barrow [D]Sen. Louie Bernard [R]Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D]Sen. Stewart Cathey [R]
Sen. Heather Cloud [R]Sen. Patrick Cortez [R]Sen. Michael Fesi [R]Sen. Cleo Fields [D]
Sen. Bob Hensgens [R]Sen. Sharon Hewitt [R]Sen. Katrina Jackson [D]Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D]
Sen. Patrick McMath [R]Sen. Robert Mills [R]Sen. Beth Mizell [R]Sen. Barrow Peacock [R]
Sen. Rogers Pope [R]Sen. Edward Price [D]Sen. Gary Smith [D]Sen. Kirk Talbot [R]
Sen. Gregory Tarver [D]Sen. Rick Ward [R]Sen. Mack White [R]

Roll Calls

2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 7 CO-AUTHORS (#382) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 7 CONCUR (#381) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Vote on HCR 7 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#338) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-27HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2021-05-24SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-05-20HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-05-18HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2021-05-18SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2021-05-17SenateReported favorably.
2021-05-12SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2021-05-11SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-11HouseRead by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 100, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-06HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2021.
2021-05-03HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-29HouseReported with amendments (9-0).
2021-04-13HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2021-04-12HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HCR7&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213161
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219006
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226135
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213980
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218976
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213163
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219112
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1238218
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223286
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225768
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225772

Bill Comments 750

feedback