LA HCR48 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Wednesday, April 6, 2016, as New Orleans Day at the legislature
Title
Designates Wednesday, April 6, 2016, as New Orleans Day at the legislature
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 48 ADOPT (#145) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-04-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-04-05 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2016-04-04 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |