LA HCR15 | 2011 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests that the Southern University Board of Supervisors name the SUNO administration building in honor of former chancellor Dr. Emmett W. Bashful
Title
Requests that the Southern University Board of Supervisors name the SUNO administration building in honor of former chancellor Dr. Emmett W. Bashful
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 15, HCR 15 BY BISHOP (#86) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-15 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2011-04-07 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-04-06 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-04-05 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2011-04-05 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |
2011-04-05 | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. | |
2011-04-05 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2011-04-04 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |