LA HCR114 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the Louisiana State Law Institute to study and make recommendations relative to the feasibility of codifying certain cases relative to R.S. 38:113
Title
Urges and requests the Louisiana State Law Institute to study and make recommendations relative to the feasibility of codifying certain cases relative to R.S. 38:113
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 114 CONCUR (#1070) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Vote on HCR 114 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1130) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Vote on HCR 114 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1130) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-01 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-25 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2022. |
2022-05-24 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-23 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2022-05-16 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-05-12 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |