LA HB994 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-18 - Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-18 - Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to TOPS, provides, under specified circumstances, for the repayment by a student of an award amount paid on his behalf by the state during the first two award years
Title
Relative to TOPS, provides, under specified circumstances, for the repayment by a student of an award amount paid on his behalf by the state during the first two award years
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-18 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2010-05-17 | Reported favorably (6-5) (Regular) To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-19 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2010-03-19 | Prefiled. |