LA HB933 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-16 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-16 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain transactions between a hospital service district and a board member and legal entities in which a board member owns an interest
Title
Authorizes certain transactions between a hospital service district and a board member and legal entities in which a board member owns an interest
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 933, FINAL PASSAGE (#456) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-16 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2010-06-16 | Rules suspended | |
2010-06-11 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-10 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-09 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2010-04-29 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-04-28 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-04-28 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-22 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 28, 2010. | |
2010-04-21 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-20 | Reported with amendments (15-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-18 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-03-18 | Prefiled. |