LA HB763 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB90
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - Effective date: 6/11/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - Effective date: 6/11/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to federal election guidance and funding
Title
Provides relative to federal election guidance and funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-29 - House - House Vote on HB 763 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1565) (Y: 76 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 763 FINAL PASSAGE (#1138) (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 763 FINAL PASSAGE (#168) (Y: 78 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 763 FINAL PASSAGE (#1138) (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 763 FINAL PASSAGE (#168) (Y: 78 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-11 | House | Effective date: 6/11/2024. |
2024-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 636. |
2024-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-30 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-29 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 76, nays 12, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2024-05-23 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/29/2024. |
2024-05-23 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 6 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 26. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/02/2024. |
2024-03-26 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-25 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 90 reported by the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs (12-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB90 (Replaces) 2024-03-25 - Becomes HB 763.