LA HB90 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Becomes HB 763.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Becomes HB 763.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to federal election guidance and funding
Title
Provides relative to federal election guidance and funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Becomes HB 763. |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported by substitute (12-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-02-16 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/16/2024. |
2024-02-15 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-02-15 | House | Prefiled. |