LA HB709 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to per diem for members and board of commissioners of levee districts and levee and drainage districts (EN +$55,527 LF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to per diem for members and board of commissioners of levee districts and levee and drainage districts (EN +$55,527 LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 709 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#977) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 709 FINAL PASSAGE (#809) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 709 FINAL PASSAGE (#192) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 709 FINAL PASSAGE (#809) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 709 FINAL PASSAGE (#192) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2015. |
2015-07-01 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 423. |
2015-06-11 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2015-06-10 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-09 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2015-06-07 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015. |
2015-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-05 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/05/2015. |
2015-04-29 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-04-28 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2015-04-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2015-04-03 | House | Prefiled. |