LA HB619 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-15 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-15 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to the use of a wireless telecommunications device while operating a motor vehicle
Title
Provides with respect to the use of a wireless telecommunications device while operating a motor vehicle
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 619 AMENDMENT # 4416 BY CORTEZ HB 619 BY HUVAL (#1173) (Y: 14 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 619 FINAL PASSAGE (#731) (Y: 53 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 619 FINAL PASSAGE (#470) (Y: 45 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 619 FINAL PASSAGE (#731) (Y: 53 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 619 FINAL PASSAGE (#470) (Y: 45 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-05-03 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 53, nays 34. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-04-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Notice given. |
2018-04-26 | House | Notice removed |
2018-04-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/18. |
2018-04-19 | House | Notice given. |
2018-04-18 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2018-04-18 | House | Motion to reconsider pending. |
2018-04-18 | House | Rules suspended. |
2018-04-17 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 45, nays 48. Failed to pass. |
2018-04-17 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-04-17 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-04-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/18. |
2018-04-11 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |