LA HB575 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes requirements for transportation network companies (RE1 +$115,000 SG EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes requirements for transportation network companies (RE1 +$115,000 SG EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 575 FINAL PASSAGE (#86) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2019-05-22SenateSenate Committee amendments read and adopted.
2019-05-21SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2019-05-01SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2019-04-30SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-04-29HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-04-25HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/29/19.
2019-04-24HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-23HouseReported with amendments (17-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB575&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122369
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126700
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128763
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126153
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126279
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126398
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127296
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128668
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128487
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128408
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128400
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136174
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137305
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137484
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122376
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126203
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126823
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128850
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130897
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136323
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137585
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128704

Bill Comments

feedback