LA HB575 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Becomes HB 895.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Becomes HB 895.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to safety, provides for instruction in public schools and public postsecondary education institutions, provides for reporting online content to school and campus security officers and local law enforcement agencies (OR SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)
Title
Relative to safety, provides for instruction in public schools and public postsecondary education institutions, provides for reporting online content to school and campus security officers and local law enforcement agencies (OR SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Becomes HB 895. |
2018-04-11 | House | Reported by substitute (9-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |