LA HB50 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-26 - By a vote of 20 yeas and 14 nays.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-26 - By a vote of 20 yeas and 14 nays.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes local taxing authorities to enter into cooperative endeavor agreements that provide for payments in lieu of taxes (Item #28) (RE SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Title
Authorizes local taxing authorities to enter into cooperative endeavor agreements that provide for payments in lieu of taxes (Item #28) (RE SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Ivey [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 50 RECOMMIT (#128) (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - House Vote on HB 50 FINAL PASSAGE (#62) (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - House Vote on HB 50 FINAL PASSAGE (#62) (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-26 | Senate | By a vote of 20 yeas and 14 nays. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-06-17 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 12. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-06-17 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2020-06-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/17/20. |
2020-06-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-06-11 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2020-06-08 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |