LA HB153 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Effective date: 06/15/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Effective date: 06/15/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Twinbrook Security District in Orleans Parish
Title
Provides relative to the Twinbrook Security District in Orleans Parish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 153 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1668) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 153 ADOPT (#1410) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 153 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1297) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 153 FINAL PASSAGE (#1021) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 153 FINAL PASSAGE (#334) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 153 ADOPT (#1410) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 153 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1297) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 153 FINAL PASSAGE (#1021) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 153 FINAL PASSAGE (#334) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | House | Effective date: 06/15/2022. |
2022-06-15 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 441. |
2022-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2022-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2022-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2022. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2022-06-02 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2022-06-02 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Bouie, Henry, and Carter. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2022-06-02 | House | House conferees appointed: Freeman, Edmonds, and Freiberg. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2022-06-01 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2022-05-31 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/01/2022. |
2022-05-31 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-15 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-19 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/19/2022. |
2022-04-11 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2022-02-25 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/25/2022. |
2022-02-23 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2022-02-23 | House | Prefiled. |