LA HB1426 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - Notice removed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - Notice removed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends property restrictions regarding video draw poker establishments
Title
Amends property restrictions regarding video draw poker establishments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | Notice removed. | |
2010-05-20 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 25, 2010. | |
2010-05-20 | Notice given. | |
2010-05-20 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-05-13 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 20, 2010. | |
2010-05-13 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-12 | Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). | |
2010-04-21 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-04-20 | Read by title. |