LA HB1404 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-02 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 44, nays 45. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-02 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 44, nays 45. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a local sales and use tax exemption for the procurement or administration of certain prescription drugs (EG DECREASE LF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for a local sales and use tax exemption for the procurement or administration of certain prescription drugs (EG DECREASE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Mills [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 1404, FINAL PASSAGE (#1120) (Y: 44 N: 45 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Vote on HB 1404, FINAL PASSAGE (#979) (Y: 46 N: 43 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Vote on HB 1404, FINAL PASSAGE (#979) (Y: 46 N: 43 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 44, nays 45. Failed to pass. | |
2010-05-25 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/2/2010. | |
2010-05-25 | Notice given. | |
2010-05-25 | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. | |
2010-05-24 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 46, nays 43. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending. | |
2010-05-24 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-05-17 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 24, 2010. | |
2010-05-17 | Notice given. | |
2010-05-17 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-05-13 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 17, 2010. | |
2010-05-12 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-11 | Reported with amendments (10-5) (Regular). | |
2010-04-21 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2010-04-20 | Read by title. |