LA HB1278 | 2010 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB575
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the delivery of certain scrap materials to scrap metal collection and recycling facilities
Title
Authorizes the delivery of certain scrap materials to scrap metal collection and recycling facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1278, FINAL PASSAGE (#1231) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1278, FINAL PASSAGE (#292) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1278, FINAL PASSAGE (#292) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-06-21 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 410. | |
2010-06-11 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-10 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-10 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-09 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-09 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-01 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-27 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-26 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2010-04-21 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. | |
2010-04-21 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 21, 2010. | |
2010-04-14 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-13 | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 575 reported by the Committee on Commerce (10-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB575 (Replaces) 2010-04-13 - Becomes HB 1278.