LA HB1104 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Lafayette Parish Redevelopment Authority
Title
Creates the Lafayette Parish Redevelopment Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-05-20 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 25, 2010. | |
2010-05-17 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |
2010-05-13 | Reported favorably (14-0) (Local and Consent). | |
2010-04-13 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2010-04-12 | Read by title. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-19 | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |