KY SR32 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-10 - adopted 36-0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-10 - adopted 36-0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
A resolution urging the Kentucky Department of Veterans' Affairs, the Governor of the Commonwealth of Kentucky, and Kentucky's United States Congressional delegation to take the appropriate steps to get the approval and funding necessary for the construction of a veterans center in Bowling Green, Kentucky.
Title
A resolution urging the Kentucky Department of Veterans' Affairs, the Governor of the Commonwealth of Kentucky, and Kentucky's United States Congressional delegation to take the appropriate steps to get the approval and funding necessary for the construction of a veterans center in Bowling Green, Kentucky.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Wilson [R] | Sen. C.B. Embry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Senate | adopted 36-0 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2015 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-03 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2015-01-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/SR32.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/SR32/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/SR32/vote_history.pdf |