KY SR174 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - adopted 38-0 with committee amendment (1)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - adopted 38-0 with committee amendment (1)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Confirm Executive Order 2014-899, dated November 7, 2014, appointing Barry G. Noffsinger to the Kentucky Housing Corporation Board of Directors for a term expiring October 30, 2018.
Title
Confirm Executive Order 2014-899, dated November 7, 2014, appointing Barry G. Noffsinger to the Kentucky Housing Corporation Board of Directors for a term expiring October 30, 2018.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Seum [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | Senate | adopted 38-0 with committee amendment (1) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 23, 2015 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with committee amendment (1) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | introduced in Senate |