KY SB49 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 153)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 153)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 337.010 to exclude providers of certain home or community based services from the definition of employee in regards to payment of wages; amend KRS 342.650 to exempt certain home or community based services from coverage in regards to workers’ compensation; amend KRS 341.055 to exclude certain home or community based services from “covered employment” in regards to unemployment compensation.
Title
AN ACT relating to home and community based services waiver providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 418 (Y: 68 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 417 (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1798 (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 305 (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1565 (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 417 (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1798 (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 305 (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1565 (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 153) |
2021-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-29 | House | received in Senate |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Bill passed 68-26 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | veto overridden |
2021-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2021-03-29 | Senate | to Rules (H) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | received in House |
2021-03-29 | House | Bill passed 24-13 |
2021-03-29 | House | veto overridden |
2021-03-29 | House | posted for consideration of Governor's veto |
2021-03-29 | House | to Rules (S) |
2021-03-29 | House | received in Senate |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Vetoed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 72-20 |
2021-03-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 12, 2021 |
2021-03-04 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-03 | House | returned to Small Business & Information Technology (H) |
2021-03-03 | House | 1st reading |
2021-03-03 | House | taken from Small Business & Information Technology (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-26 | House | to Small Business & Information Technology (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | received in House |
2021-02-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 28-7 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 24, 2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Medicaid
Personnel and Employment
Small Business
Unemployment Compensation
Wages and Hours
Workers' Compensation
Workforce
Personnel and Employment
Small Business
Unemployment Compensation
Wages and Hours
Workers' Compensation
Workforce