KY SB197 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-14 - to Rules (S)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-14 - to Rules (S)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 223.400 to define "water well driller's assistant"; amend KRS 223.405 to require anyone who engages in activities associated with drilling a water well to have a valid certificate as a water well driller or water well driller's assistant; amend KRS 223.425 to delete the examination exemption for persons in business since 1984 and establish the application, examination, and other requirements for certified water well driller's assistants; amend KRS 223.447 to establish fees for water well driller's assistant certifications; and amend KRS 223.450 to include water well driller's assistants to comply with requirements before performing work.
Title
AN ACT relating to water well drillers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 466 (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 465 (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 522 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 522 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 465 (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 522 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 522 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-14 | House | to Rules (S) |
2018-04-14 | House | received in House |
2018-04-14 | Senate | floor amendment (2-title) ruled out of order |
2018-04-14 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in House floor amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2018-04-13 | Senate | passed over and retained for concurrence |
2018-04-13 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House floor amendments (1) and (2-title) for Friday, April 13, 2018 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-04-02 | House | 3rd reading, passed 87-1 with floor amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2018-04-02 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed |
2018-03-27 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 29, 2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-03-20 | House | posted in committee |
2018-03-14 | House | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2018-03-12 | House | received in House |
2018-03-09 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 9, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-02-23 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | introduced in Senate |