KY SB168 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 161.720 to include failure to successfully meet the requirements of a corrective action plan as a reason for termination or suspension of a continuing service contract; amend KRS 161.740 to establish a new process for teachers who are first hired after July 1, 2015, to achieve continuing service contract status; amend KRS 156.844 and KRS 156.844 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to teacher tenure.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-18 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2014-03-05 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB168.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB168/bill.doc |