KY HJR37 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 080)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 080)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designate Radcliff, Kentucky, as the "Knife Capital of Kentucky."
Title
A JOINT RESOLUTION designating Radcliff, Kentucky, as the "Knife Capital of Kentucky."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 361 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, scta 1 RSN# 1009 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 213 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 212 (Y: 81 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, scta 1 RSN# 1009 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 213 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 212 (Y: 81 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 080) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | passed 92-0 |
2019-03-14 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-03-14 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-03-14 | House | to Rules (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | received in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with floor amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2019-03-01 | House | floor amendment (1) and (2-title) filed |
2019-03-01 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 4, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-28 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-02-26 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-06 | House | to State Government (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | introduced in House |