KY HB744 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 141 to allow wage assessment incentives of 4 percent to go to an eligible company for the recruitment and retainment of remote workers; provide that the eligible company must make an investment of $10 million dollars in up-front investment; apply to taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2022; require reporting by the Department of Revenue; amend KRS 131.190 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to wage assessments for remote workers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-18 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-16 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2022-03-14 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-14 | House | 1st reading |
2022-03-14 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-01 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-01 | House | introduced in House |